OK SB1018 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 27 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-27 - Approved by Governor 04/26/2016
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 27 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-27 - Approved by Governor 04/26/2016
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Commercial driver licenses; authorizing certain license be issued; requirements; allowing rules for implementation. Effective date.
Title
Commercial driver licenses; authorizing certain license be issued; requirements; allowing rules for implementation. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-04-19 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 73 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 22) [PASS]
2016-03-23 - House - House: Agriculture and Rural Development Committee: DO PASS (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-09 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2016-03-23 - House - House: Agriculture and Rural Development Committee: DO PASS (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-09 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-27 | Senate | Approved by Governor 04/26/2016 |
2016-04-20 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2016-04-20 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2016-04-20 | Senate | Enrolled, to House |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Referred for enrollment |
2016-04-19 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2016-04-19 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 73 Nays: 6 |
2016-04-19 | House | General Order |
2016-03-23 | House | CR; Do Pass Agriculture and Rural Development Committee |
2016-03-16 | House | Second Reading referred to Agriculture and Rural Development |
2016-03-10 | House | First Reading |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2016-03-09 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2016-03-09 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 43 Nays: 0 |
2016-03-09 | Senate | coauthored by Wright (principal House author) |
2016-03-09 | Senate | General Order, Amended |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Public Safety committee; CR filed |
2016-02-02 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Public Safety |
2016-02-01 | Senate | Authored by Senator Schulz |
2016-02-01 | Senate | First Reading |