OK SB1141 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 13 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-23 - CCR submitted
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Status: Engrossed on March 13 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-23 - CCR submitted
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Summary
Civil cases; relating to flat-fee schedule; modifying certain assessment.
Title
Civil cases; relating to flat-fee schedule; modifying certain assessment.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-04-09 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee Meeting: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-03 - House - House: Appropriations/Sub-Judiciary Committee Meeting: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-03 - House - House: Appropriations/Sub-Judiciary Committee Meeting: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-23 | House | CCR submitted |
2014-05-23 | Senate | Measure and Emergency passed, to House: Ayes: 44 Nays: 0 |
2014-05-23 | Senate | CCR adopted, GCCA |
2014-05-23 | Senate | CCR read, GCCA |
2014-05-05 | Senate | SCs named GCCA |
2014-05-05 | House | Conference granted, naming GCCA |
2014-04-30 | Senate | HAs rejected, conference requested |
2014-04-29 | Senate | Remove as coauthor Senator Holt |
2014-04-22 | Senate | HAs read |
2014-04-22 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2014-04-21 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2014-04-21 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed and Emergency failed: Ayes: 51 Nays: 41; Ayes: 46 Nays: 36 |
2014-04-21 | House | Motion to reconsider adopted: Ayes: 60 Nays: 19 |
2014-04-16 | House | Notice served to reconsider vote by Representative McCullough |
2014-04-16 | House | Third Reading, Measure failed: Ayes: 42 Nays: 46 |
2014-04-16 | House | General Order |
2014-04-10 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Committee |
2014-03-18 | House | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget |
2014-03-13 | House | First Reading |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2014-03-12 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2014-03-12 | Senate | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 39 Nays: 0 |
2014-03-12 | Senate | Title restored |
2014-03-12 | Senate | General Order, Amended |
2014-02-19 | Senate | coauthored by Holt |
2014-02-19 | Senate | Title stricken |
2014-02-19 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed |
2014-02-11 | Senate | Referred to Appropriations |
2014-02-11 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Judiciary committee; CR filed |
2014-02-04 | Senate | coauthored by Inman |
2014-02-04 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Judiciary Committee then to Appropriations Committee |
2014-02-03 | Senate | coauthored by McCullough (principal House author) |
2014-02-03 | Senate | Authored by Senator Jolley |
2014-02-03 | Senate | First Reading |