OK SB1212 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 31-1)
Status: Vetoed on May 11 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-11 - Vetoed 05/11/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on May 11 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-11 - Vetoed 05/11/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Firearms; modifying inclusions on unlawful carry; allowing firearms to be carried without a license. Effective date.
Title
Firearms; modifying inclusions on unlawful carry; allowing firearms to be carried without a license. Effective date.
Sponsors
Sen. Nathan Dahm [R] | Rep. Sean Roberts [R] | Rep. Kevin Calvey [R] | Rep. John Enns [R] |
Rep. George Faught [R] | Rep. Jason Murphey [R] | Rep. John Bennett [R] | Rep. Terry O'Donnell [R] |
Rep. Jeff Coody [R] | Rep. Chuck Strohm [R] | Rep. Greg Babinec [R] | Rep. Scott McEachin [R] |
Rep. Kevin McDugle [R] | Rep. Mark Lawson [R] | Rep. Justin Humphrey [R] | Rep. Kyle Hilbert [R] |
Rep. Tom Gann [R] | Rep. Avery Frix [R] | Rep. Tim Downing [R] | Rep. Dale Derby [R] |
Rep. Kevin West [R] | Rep. Josh West [R] | Rep. Rick West [R] | Rep. Johnny Tadlock [D] |
Rep. John Jordan [R] | Rep. Mark McBride [R] | Rep. Bobby Cleveland [R] | Rep. Lewis Moore [R] |
Rep. Todd Russ [R] | Sen. Josh Brecheen [R] | Sen. Joseph Silk [R] | Sen. James Leewright [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-05-02 - Senate - Senate: FOURTH READING (Y: 33 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-04-25 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 59 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2018-04-25 - House - House: ADOPT AMENDMENT (Y: 61 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2018-04-12 - House - House: General Government Oversight and Accountability Committee: DO PASS (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-06 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-04-25 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 59 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2018-04-25 - House - House: ADOPT AMENDMENT (Y: 61 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2018-04-12 - House - House: General Government Oversight and Accountability Committee: DO PASS (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-06 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-11 | Senate | Vetoed 05/11/2018 |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2018-05-02 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2018-05-02 | Senate | Enrolled, to House |
2018-05-02 | Senate | Referred for enrollment |
2018-05-02 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 33 Nays: 9 |
2018-05-02 | Senate | HAs adopted AYES: 32 NAYS: 11 |
2018-04-26 | Senate | HAs read |
2018-04-26 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2018-04-25 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2018-04-25 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 59 Nays: 28 |
2018-04-25 | House | Ayes: 61 Nays: 24 |
2018-04-25 | House | Amended |
2018-04-25 | House | Coauthored by Senator(s) Brecheen, Silk, Leewright, Murdock |
2018-04-25 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Coody, Strohm, Calvey, Moore, Humphrey, Hilbert, Frix, Gann, Cleveland, Babinec, Jordan, West (Kevin), Enns, Murphey, Downing, McBride, Faught, ODonnell, Lawson, Bennett (John), West (Rick), Russ, Tadlock, McEachin, Derby, West (Josh), McDugle |
2018-04-25 | House | General Order |
2018-04-12 | House | CR; Do Pass General Government Committee |
2018-04-06 | House | Referred to General Government Oversight and Accountability |
2018-04-06 | House | Withdrawn from Judiciary Committee |
2018-03-19 | House | Second Reading referred to Judiciary |
2018-03-07 | House | First Reading |
2018-03-07 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 44 Nays: 0 |
2018-03-06 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Public Safety committee; CR filed |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Roberts (Sean) (principal House author) |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Public Safety |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Authored by Senator Dahm |
2018-02-05 | Senate | First Reading |