OK SB1358 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 13 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-03-25 - Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget
Pending: House Appropriations and Budget Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 13 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-03-25 - Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget
Pending: House Appropriations and Budget Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Workforce development; creating the Workforce Development Revolving Fund; providing purpose; making an appropriation. Effective date.
Title
Workforce development; creating the Workforce Development Revolving Fund; providing purpose; making an appropriation. Effective date.
Sponsors
Sen. Adam Pugh [R] | Rep. Anthony Moore [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-03-12 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 31 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Appropriations: DO PASS (Y: 14 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Education: DO PASS (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Appropriations: DO PASS (Y: 14 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Education: DO PASS (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-25 | House | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget |
2024-03-13 | House | First Reading |
2024-03-13 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2024-03-12 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2024-03-12 | Senate | Emergency failed: Ayes: 31 Nays: 12 |
2024-03-12 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 31 Nays: 12 |
2024-03-12 | Senate | General Order, Amended |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Moore (principal House author) |
2024-02-28 | Senate | Title stricken |
2024-02-28 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed |
2024-02-20 | Senate | Referred to Appropriations |
2024-02-20 | Senate | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Education committee; CR filed |
2024-02-06 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Education Committee then to Appropriations Committee |
2024-02-05 | Senate | Authored by Senator Pugh |
2024-02-05 | Senate | First Reading |