OK SB1422 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 21 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-02 - CR; Do Pass Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 21 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-02 - CR; Do Pass Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Industrial hemp; creating the Oklahoma Industrial Hemp Task Force. Emergency.
Title
Industrial hemp; creating the Oklahoma Industrial Hemp Task Force. Emergency.
Sponsors
Sen. Roland Pederson [R] | Rep. Dell Kerbs [R] | Rep. Randy Randleman [R] | Sen. Jo Dossett [D] |
Rep. David Smith [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-04-02 - House - House: Agriculture Committee: DO PASS (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-20 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 45 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Agriculture & Rural Affairs: DO PASS (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-12 - Senate - Senate: : DO PASS (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-20 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 45 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Agriculture & Rural Affairs: DO PASS (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-12 - Senate - Senate: : DO PASS (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-02 | House | CR; Do Pass Agriculture Committee |
2024-03-25 | House | Second Reading referred to Agriculture |
2024-02-21 | House | First Reading |
2024-02-21 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2024-02-20 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2024-02-20 | Senate | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 45 Nays: 1 |
2024-02-20 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2024-02-19 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Dossett |
2024-02-12 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Randleman |
2024-02-12 | Senate | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Agriculture and Rural Affairs committee; CR filed |
2024-02-06 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Agriculture and Rural Affairs |
2024-02-05 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Kerbs (principal House author) |
2024-02-05 | Senate | Authored by Senator Pederson |
2024-02-05 | Senate | First Reading |