OK SB1445 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 16 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-05-06 - Second Reading, direct to Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 16 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-05-06 - Second Reading, direct to Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Teacher retirement; authorizing certain teachers to return after retirement with no earnings limitations.
Title
Teacher retirement; authorizing certain teachers to return after retirement with no earnings limitations.
Sponsors
Sen. Brenda Stanley [R] | Rep. Jadine Nollan [R] | Sen. Ron Sharp [R] | Sen. David Bullard [R] |
Sen. Darcy Jech [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-12 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 39 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Retirement And Insurance: DO PASS AS AMENDED (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Retirement And Insurance: DO PASS AS AMENDED (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-06 | House | Second Reading, direct to Calendar |
2020-03-16 | House | First Reading |
2020-03-16 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 39 Nays: 8 |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Title restored |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Bullard |
2020-03-12 | Senate | General Order, Amended |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Sharp |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Title stricken |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Retirement and Insurance committee; CR filed |
2020-02-17 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Nollan (principal House author) |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Retirement and Insurance |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Remove as author Senator Smalley; authored by Senator Stanley |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Authored by Senator Smalley |
2020-02-03 | Senate | First Reading |