OK SB1742 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 11 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-05-11 - Second Reading rescinded
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 11 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-05-11 - Second Reading rescinded
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Oklahoma Water Resources Board; specifying requirement for protest hearings; establishing timeline for issuance of unprotested permits. authorizing Executive Director to issue certain permits. Effective date.
Title
Oklahoma Water Resources Board; specifying requirement for protest hearings; establishing timeline for issuance of unprotested permits. authorizing Executive Director to issue certain permits. Effective date.
Sponsors
Sen. Kim David [R] | Rep. Harold Wright [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-10 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 30 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2020-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Energy: DO PASS AS AMENDED (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Energy: DO PASS AS AMENDED (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-11 | House | Second Reading rescinded |
2020-05-06 | House | Second Reading, direct to Calendar |
2020-03-11 | House | First Reading |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 30 Nays: 12 |
2020-03-10 | Senate | General Order, Amended by Floor Substitute |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Energy committee; CR filed |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Wright (principal House author) |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Energy |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Authored by Senator David |
2020-02-03 | Senate | First Reading |