OK SB1819 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-3)
Status: Passed on May 5 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-05 - Approved by Governor 05/04/2010
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-3)
Status: Passed on May 5 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-05 - Approved by Governor 05/04/2010
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Schools; relating to the donation of blood; permitting a person sixteen years of age to donate blood under certain circumstance. Effective date.
Title
Schools; relating to the donation of blood; permitting a person sixteen years of age to donate blood under certain circumstance. Effective date.
Sponsors
Rep. Don Armes [R] | Rep. Doug Cox [R] | Sen. Brian Crain [R] | Rep. David Derby [R] |
Rep. Joe Dorman [D] | Rep. George Faught [R] | Sen. Constance Johnson [D] | Sen. Anastasia Pittman [D] |
Roll Calls
2010-04-15 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2010-03-25 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Subcommittee on Health & Social Services: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-25 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Subcommittee on Health & Social Services: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-05 | Approved by Governor 05/04/2010 | |
2010-04-29 | Sent to Governor | |
2010-04-29 | Signed, returned to Senate | |
2010-04-29 | Enrolled, to House | |
2010-04-28 | Referred for enrollment | |
2010-04-28 | Measure passed: Ayes: 27 Nays: 0 | |
2010-04-28 | HAs adopted | |
2010-04-19 | HAs read | |
2010-04-19 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | |
2010-04-15 | Referred for engrossment | |
2010-04-15 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 95 Nays: 0 | |
2010-04-15 | General Order | |
2010-04-12 | Emergency removed | |
2010-04-12 | Title restored | |
2010-04-12 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Faught, Pittman, Derby, Armes, Dorman | |
2010-04-12 | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Committee | |
2010-03-16 | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget | |
2010-03-02 | First Reading | |
2010-03-02 | Engrossed to House | |
2010-03-01 | Referred for engrossment | |
2010-03-01 | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 45 Nays: 0 | |
2010-03-01 | Title stricken | |
2010-03-01 | General Order, Amended | |
2010-02-22 | coauthored by Cox (principal House author) | |
2010-02-22 | coauthored by Johnson (Constance) | |
2010-02-22 | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Health and Human Services committee; CR filed | |
2010-02-18 | Pending authorship Representative(s) Cox | |
2010-02-18 | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Health and Human Services committee; pending CR | |
2010-02-18 | Pending coauthorship Senator(s) Johnson (Constance) | |
2010-02-02 | Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services | |
2010-02-01 | Authored by Senator Crain | |
2010-02-01 | First Reading |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
63 | 1 | 1985 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
63 | 2152 | New Code | See Bill Text |