OK SB1863 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 12-6)
Status: Passed on May 8 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-08 - Approved by Governor 05/08/2012
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 12-6)
Status: Passed on May 8 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-08 - Approved by Governor 05/08/2012
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Occupations; creating Post-Military Service Occupation, Education and Credentialing Act. Effective date.
Title
Occupations; creating Post-Military Service Occupation, Education and Credentialing Act. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-05-01 - Senate - Senate: Fourth Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2012-04-23 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 92 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2012-04-02 - House - House: Veterans & Military Affairs Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-07 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-04-23 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 92 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2012-04-02 - House - House: Veterans & Military Affairs Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-07 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-08 | Approved by Governor 05/08/2012 | |
2012-05-02 | Sent to Governor | |
2012-05-02 | Signed, returned to Senate | |
2012-05-02 | Enrolled, to House | |
2012-05-01 | Referred for enrollment | |
2012-05-01 | Measure passed: Ayes: 41 Nays: 0 | |
2012-05-01 | coauthored by Allen, Paddack | |
2012-05-01 | HAs adopted | |
2012-04-24 | HAs read | |
2012-04-24 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | |
2012-04-23 | Referred for engrossment | |
2012-04-23 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 92 Nays: 1 | |
2012-04-23 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Inman, Hardin, Roberts (Dustin), Sherrer, Kern, Walker | |
2012-04-23 | General Order | |
2012-04-04 | Title restored | |
2012-04-04 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Wesselhoft, Bennett | |
2012-04-04 | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Veterans and Military Affairs Committee | |
2012-03-19 | Second Reading referred to Veterans and Military Affairs | |
2012-03-08 | First Reading | |
2012-03-08 | Engrossed to House | |
2012-03-07 | Referred for engrossment | |
2012-03-07 | Measure passed: Ayes: 44 Nays: 0 | |
2012-03-07 | coauthored by Simpson, Johnson (Constance) | |
2012-03-07 | General Order, Considered | |
2012-03-01 | coauthored by David, Ivester | |
2012-03-01 | Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed | |
2012-02-21 | Referred to Appropriations | |
2012-02-21 | coauthored by Brecheen, Stanislawski | |
2012-02-21 | coauthored by Coody (principal House author) | |
2012-02-21 | Title stricken | |
2012-02-21 | Reported Do Pass as amended Education committee; CR filed | |
2012-02-08 | Second Reading referred to Education Committee then to Appropriations Committee | |
2012-02-06 | Authored by Senator Russell | |
2012-02-06 | First Reading |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
59 | 4100 | 1 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
59 | 4100 | 2 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
59 | 4100 | 3 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
59 | 4100 | 4 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
59 | 4100 | 5 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
59 | 4100 | 6 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
59 | 4100 | 7 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |