OK SB1960 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Vetoed on May 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-28 - Vetoed 06/10/2010
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Status: Vetoed on May 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-28 - Vetoed 06/10/2010
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Airports; creating the Aircraft Pilot and Passenger Protection Act. Effective date.
Title
Airports; creating the Aircraft Pilot and Passenger Protection Act. Effective date.
Sponsors
Rep. Gary Banz [R] | Sen. Harry Coates [R] | Sen. Kenneth Corn [D] | Sen. Tom Ivester [D] |
Rep. Danny Morgan [D] | Sen. David Myers [R] | Sen. Anastasia Pittman [D] | Rep. Tahrohon Shannon [R] |
Rep. John Wright [R] |
Roll Calls
2010-05-27 - House - House: (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2010-04-21 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 92 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2010-04-08 - House - House: Transportation Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-21 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 92 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2010-04-08 - House - House: Transportation Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-28 | Vetoed 06/10/2010 | |
2010-05-28 | Veto message read | |
2010-05-28 | Sent to Governor | |
2010-05-28 | Signed, returned to Senate | |
2010-05-28 | Enrolled, to House | |
2010-05-28 | Referred for enrollment | |
2010-05-27 | To Senate | |
2010-05-27 | Measure passed: Ayes: 95 Nays: 0 | |
2010-05-27 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Pittman, Shannon | |
2010-05-27 | Remove Representative Shannon as principal House author and substitute with Representative Morgan | |
2010-05-27 | Remove as coauthor Representative(s) Morgan | |
2010-05-27 | CCR adopted | |
2010-05-25 | CCR submitted | |
2010-05-25 | Measure passed, to House: Ayes: 46 Nays: 0 | |
2010-05-25 | CCR adopted | |
2010-05-18 | Title restored | |
2010-05-18 | CCR read | |
2010-05-06 | Conference granted, HC's named Shannon, Joyner, Morgan, Banz, Jackson, McAffrey | |
2010-05-04 | SCs named Coates, Branan, Marlatt, Myers, Bass, Ivester | |
2010-05-03 | HAs rejected, conference requested | |
2010-04-26 | HAs read | |
2010-04-22 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | |
2010-04-21 | Referred for engrossment | |
2010-04-21 | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 92 Nays: 7 | |
2010-04-21 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Morgan, Banz, Wright (John) | |
2010-04-21 | General Order | |
2010-04-12 | Coauthored by Senator(s) Ivester, Corn | |
2010-04-12 | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Transportation Committee | |
2010-03-16 | Second Reading referred to Transportation | |
2010-03-08 | First Reading | |
2010-03-08 | Engrossed to House | |
2010-03-04 | Referred for engrossment | |
2010-03-04 | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 40 Nays: 0 | |
2010-03-04 | General Order, Amended by Floor Substitute | |
2010-02-22 | coauthored by Shannon (principal House author) | |
2010-02-22 | coauthored by Myers | |
2010-02-22 | Title stricken | |
2010-02-22 | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Transportation committee; CR filed | |
2010-02-18 | Pending authorship Representative(s) Shannon | |
2010-02-18 | Pending coauthorship Senator(s) Myers | |
2010-02-10 | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Transportation committee; pending CR | |
2010-02-02 | Second Reading referred to Transportation | |
2010-02-01 | Authored by Senator Coates | |
2010-02-01 | First Reading |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
3 | 120 | 1 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
3 | 120 | 10 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
3 | 120 | 11 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
3 | 120 | 12 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
3 | 120 | 13 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
3 | 120 | 14 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
3 | 120 | 2 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
3 | 120 | 3 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
3 | 120 | 4 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
3 | 120 | 5 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
3 | 120 | 6 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
3 | 120 | 7 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
3 | 120 | 8 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
3 | 120 | 9 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |