OK SB2290 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 11 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-12 - Coauthored by Representative(s) Jones
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Status: Engrossed on March 11 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-12 - Coauthored by Representative(s) Jones
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Summary
Public safety; modifying provisions relating to divisions of Department of Public Safety. Effective date.
Title
Public safety; modifying provisions relating to divisions of Department of Public Safety. Effective date.
Sponsors
Rep. John Carey [D] | Rep. Tad Jones [R] | Sen. Todd Lamb [R] |
Roll Calls
2010-03-29 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Subcommittee on Judiciary & Public Safety: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-12 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Jones | |
2010-04-12 | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Committee | |
2010-03-16 | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget | |
2010-03-11 | First Reading | |
2010-03-11 | Engrossed to House | |
2010-03-10 | Referred for engrossment | |
2010-03-10 | Measure passed: Ayes: 44 Nays: 0 | |
2010-03-10 | General Order, Considered | |
2010-02-22 | coauthored by Carey (principal House author) | |
2010-02-22 | Remove as author Senator Bingman; authored by Senator Lamb | |
2010-02-22 | Reported Do Pass Judiciary committee; CR filed | |
2010-02-18 | Pending authorship Representative(s) Carey | |
2010-02-16 | Reported Do Pass Judiciary committee; pending CR | |
2010-02-11 | Referred to Judiciary | |
2010-02-11 | Withdrawn from Appr/Sub-Public Safety and Judiciary committee | |
2010-02-11 | Withdrawn from Appropriations committee | |
2010-02-08 | Pending removal author Senator Bingman and replace with Senator Lamb | |
2010-02-02 | Referred to Appr/Sub-Public Safety and Judiciary | |
2010-02-02 | Second Reading referred to Appropriations | |
2010-02-01 | Authored by Senator Bingman | |
2010-02-01 | First Reading |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
47 | 2 | 105 | New Code | See Bill Text |
47 | 6 | 201 | New Code | See Bill Text |
63 | 4205 | New Code | See Bill Text |