OK SB243 | 2024 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB243
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 11 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 11 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Long-term care; Psychiatric and Chemical Dependency Facility Certificate of Need Ac; repealing.
Title
Long-term care; Psychiatric and Chemical Dependency Facility Certificate of Need Ac; repealing.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-11 - House - House: Rules Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-07 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 36 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2024-02-29 - Senate - Senate: Health & Human Services: DO PASS (Y: 10 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-07 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 36 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2024-02-29 - Senate - Senate: Health & Human Services: DO PASS (Y: 10 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-15 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Rules Committee |
2024-03-25 | House | Second Reading referred to Rules |
2024-03-11 | House | First Reading |
2024-03-11 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 36 Nays: 4 |
2024-03-07 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Health and Human Services committee; CR filed |
2023-02-13 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Boatman (principal House author) |
2023-02-07 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services |
2023-02-06 | Senate | Authored by Senator Daniels |
2023-02-06 | Senate | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
SB243 (Carry Over) 2023-02-13 - Coauthored by Representative Boatman (principal House author)