OK SB297 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2009 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-03-11 - Second Reading referred to Energy and Utility Regulation
Pending: House Energy and Utility Regulation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2009 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-03-11 - Second Reading referred to Energy and Utility Regulation
Pending: House Energy and Utility Regulation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Summary
Oil and gas; providing violations. Emergency.
Title
Oil and gas; providing violations. Emergency.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-03-11 | Second Reading referred to Energy and Utility Regulation | |
2009-03-03 | First Reading | |
2009-03-03 | Engrossed to House | |
2009-03-02 | Referred for engrossment | |
2009-03-02 | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 42 Nays: 0 | |
2009-03-02 | General Order, Considered | |
2009-02-23 | coauthored by Thompson (principal House author) | |
2009-02-23 | Title stricken | |
2009-02-23 | Reported Do Pass as amended Energy and Environment committee; CR filed | |
2009-02-23 | Pending authorship Representative(s) Thompson | |
2009-02-19 | Reported Do Pass as amended Energy and Environment committee; pending CR | |
2009-02-03 | Second Reading referred to Energy and Environment | |
2009-02-02 | Authored by Senator Bingman | |
2009-02-02 | First Reading |