OK SB326 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB326
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-05-06 - Second Reading, direct to Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-05-06 - Second Reading, direct to Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Agency operations; requiring disclosure of certain authority by certain time. Effective date.
Title
Agency operations; requiring disclosure of certain authority by certain time. Effective date.
Sponsors
Sen. Nathan Dahm [R] | Rep. Jon Echols [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-05 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 36 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Rules: DO PASS AS AMENDED (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Rules: DO PASS AS AMENDED (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-06 | House | Second Reading, direct to Calendar |
2020-03-09 | House | First Reading |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 36 Nays: 10 |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Title restored |
2020-03-05 | Senate | General Order, Amended |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Echols (principal House author) |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Title stricken |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Rules committee; CR filed |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Rules |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Authored by Senator Dahm |
2019-02-04 | Senate | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
SB326 (Carry Over) 2019-03-06 - Coauthored by Representative Echols (principal House author)