OK SB347 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 21 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-21 - Approved by Governor 04/21/2015
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 21 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-21 - Approved by Governor 04/21/2015
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Ethics Commission; modifying purposes for which funds may be expended. Effective date. Emergency.
Title
Ethics Commission; modifying purposes for which funds may be expended. Effective date. Emergency.
Sponsors
Sen. Clark Jolley [R] | Rep. Lisa Billy [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-04-14 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 85 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2015-04-08 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee Meeting: DO PASS (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-30 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget General Government Subcommittee Committee Meeting: DO PASS (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-10 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 45 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-04-08 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee Meeting: DO PASS (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-30 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget General Government Subcommittee Committee Meeting: DO PASS (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-10 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 45 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-21 | Senate | Approved by Governor 04/21/2015 |
2015-04-16 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2015-04-16 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2015-04-16 | Senate | Enrolled, to House |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Referred for enrollment |
2015-04-14 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2015-04-14 | House | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 85 Nays: 0 |
2015-04-14 | House | General Order |
2015-04-09 | House | CR; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Committee |
2015-03-31 | House | Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget General Government Subcommittee sub-committee |
2015-03-18 | House | Referred to Appropriations and Budget General Government Subcommittee |
2015-03-17 | House | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget |
2015-03-10 | House | First Reading |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 45 Nays: 1 |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Emergency clause restored |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Title restored |
2015-03-10 | Senate | General Order, Amended |
2015-02-11 | Senate | Emergency clause stricken |
2015-02-11 | Senate | Title stricken |
2015-02-11 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed |
2015-02-04 | Senate | coauthored by Billy (principal House author) |
2015-02-03 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Appropriations |
2015-02-02 | Senate | Authored by Senator Jolley |
2015-02-02 | Senate | First Reading |