OK SB392 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB392
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 7 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-07 - Approved by Governor 05/07/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 7 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-07 - Approved by Governor 05/07/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Pharmacists; requiring insurers to directly compensate a pharmacist in certain circumstances. Effective date.
Title
Pharmacists; requiring insurers to directly compensate a pharmacist in certain circumstances. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-21 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 86 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2021-03-31 - House - House: Insurance Committee: DO PASS (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-10 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 42 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-03-01 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Appropriations: DO PASS (Y: 17 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Retirement And Insurance: DO PASS and referred to second committee (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-31 - House - House: Insurance Committee: DO PASS (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-10 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 42 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-03-01 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Appropriations: DO PASS (Y: 17 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Retirement And Insurance: DO PASS and referred to second committee (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-07 | Senate | Approved by Governor 05/07/2021 |
2021-05-04 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2021-05-04 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2021-05-04 | Senate | Enrolled, to House |
2021-05-03 | Senate | Referred for enrollment |
2021-05-03 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 48 Nays: 0 |
2021-05-03 | Senate | HAs adopted |
2021-04-22 | Senate | HAs read |
2021-04-22 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2021-04-21 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2021-04-21 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 86 Nays: 0 |
2021-04-21 | House | Amended |
2021-04-21 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Manger |
2021-04-21 | House | General Order |
2021-04-01 | House | CR; Do Pass Insurance Committee |
2021-03-22 | House | Second Reading referred to Insurance |
2021-03-11 | House | First Reading |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 42 Nays: 2 |
2021-03-10 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2021-03-01 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Appropriations committee; CR filed |
2021-02-23 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative McEntire (principal House author) |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Referred to Appropriations |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Retirement and Insurance committee; CR filed |
2021-02-02 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Retirement and Insurance Committee then to Appropriations Committee |
2021-02-01 | Senate | Authored by Senator Standridge |
2021-02-01 | Senate | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
SB392 (Carry Over) 2021-05-07 - Approved by Governor 05/07/2021