OK SB423 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-04 - Approved by Governor 05/01/2015
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-04 - Approved by Governor 05/01/2015
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Contracts; repealing provisions for sale of second hand watches. Effective date.
Title
Contracts; repealing provisions for sale of second hand watches. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-23 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 85 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2015-04-01 - House - House: Rules Committee Meeting: DO PASS (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-03 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 44 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-04-01 - House - House: Rules Committee Meeting: DO PASS (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-03 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 44 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-04 | Senate | Approved by Governor 05/01/2015 |
2015-04-28 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2015-04-28 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2015-04-28 | Senate | Enrolled, to House |
2015-04-27 | Senate | Referred for enrollment |
2015-04-23 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2015-04-23 | House | Motion expired |
2015-04-23 | House | Notice served to reconsider vote by Representative Nelson |
2015-04-23 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 85 Nays: 1 |
2015-04-23 | House | General Order |
2015-04-01 | House | CR; Do Pass Rules Committee |
2015-03-10 | House | Second Reading referred to Rules |
2015-03-04 | House | First Reading |
2015-03-04 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2015-03-03 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2015-03-03 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 44 Nays: 1 |
2015-03-03 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2015-02-12 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Business and Commerce committee; CR filed |
2015-02-10 | Senate | coauthored by Cleveland (principal House author) |
2015-02-03 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Business and Commerce |
2015-02-02 | Senate | Authored by Senator Dahm |
2015-02-02 | Senate | First Reading |