OK SB424 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-21 - Conferees unable to agree
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-21 - Conferees unable to agree
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Intoxicating liquors; allowing sale of beer to consumer on premises of brewery.
Title
Intoxicating liquors; allowing sale of beer to consumer on premises of brewery.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-07 - House - House: Alcohol, Tobacco, and Controlled Substances Committee Meeting: DO PASS AS AMENDED, STRIKE THE ENACTING CLAUSE (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-09 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 37 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2015-03-09 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 37 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-21 | Senate | Conferees unable to agree |
2015-05-19 | House | Conference granted, naming Conference Committee on Alcohol, Tobacco, and Controlled Substances |
2015-04-29 | Senate | SCs named Crain, Newberry, Jolley, Bice, Marlatt, Sparks, Matthews |
2015-04-27 | Senate | HAs rejected, conference requested |
2015-04-16 | Senate | HAs read |
2015-04-16 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2015-04-15 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2015-04-15 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 66 Nays: 19 |
2015-04-15 | House | General Order |
2015-04-09 | House | Enacting clause stricken |
2015-04-09 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Virgin |
2015-04-09 | House | CR; Do Pass, as amended, Alcohol, Tobacco, and Controlled Substances Committee |
2015-03-11 | House | Second Reading referred to Alcohol, Tobacco, and Controlled Substances |
2015-03-10 | House | First Reading |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2015-03-09 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2015-03-09 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 37 Nays: 4 |
2015-03-09 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2015-03-02 | Senate | coauthored by Williams (principal House author) |
2015-02-26 | Senate | Emergency clause stricken |
2015-02-26 | Senate | Title stricken |
2015-02-26 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Business and Commerce committee; CR filed |
2015-02-03 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Business and Commerce |
2015-02-02 | Senate | Authored by Senator Crain |
2015-02-02 | Senate | First Reading |