OK SB535 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 27 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-27 - Approved by Governor 04/27/2015
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 27 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-27 - Approved by Governor 04/27/2015
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Department of Human Services; requiring tracking of certain information; extending certain requirement. Effective date.
Title
Department of Human Services; requiring tracking of certain information; extending certain requirement. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-20 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 72 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2015-03-24 - House - House: Children, Youth, and Family Services Committee Meeting: DO PASS (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-24 - House - House: Children, Youth, and Family Services Committee Meeting: DO PASS (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-27 | Senate | Approved by Governor 04/27/2015 |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2015-04-21 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Enrolled, to House |
2015-04-20 | Senate | Referred for enrollment |
2015-04-20 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2015-04-20 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 72 Nays: 13 |
2015-04-20 | House | General Order |
2015-03-24 | House | CR; Do Pass Children, Youth, and Family Services Committee |
2015-03-17 | House | Second Reading referred to Children, Youth, and Family Services |
2015-03-11 | House | First Reading |
2015-03-11 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2015-03-11 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2015-03-11 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 46 Nays: 0 |
2015-03-11 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2015-03-03 | Senate | coauthored by Nelson (principal House author) |
2015-02-23 | Senate | coauthored by Pittman |
2015-02-16 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Health and Human Services committee; CR filed |
2015-02-03 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services |
2015-02-02 | Senate | Authored by Senator Griffin |
2015-02-02 | Senate | First Reading |