OK SB622 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB622
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-15 - Coauthored by Representative(s) Boles
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-15 - Coauthored by Representative(s) Boles
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Cities and towns; authorizing cities and towns to paint blue lines and post signage in support of law enforcement; Municipal Police Pension and Retirement System; eligibility for membership. Effective date.
Title
Cities and towns; authorizing cities and towns to paint blue lines and post signage in support of law enforcement; Municipal Police Pension and Retirement System; eligibility for membership. Effective date.
Sponsors
Sen. Darrell Weaver [R] | Rep. Ross Ford [R] | Rep. Brad Boles [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-10 - House - House: County and Municipal Government Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 40 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Committee On General Government: DO PASS (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 40 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Committee On General Government: DO PASS (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-15 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Boles |
2019-04-15 | House | Remove Representative Boles as principal House author and substitute with Representative Ford |
2019-04-15 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute County and Municipal Government Committee |
2019-03-19 | House | Second Reading referred to County and Municipal Government |
2019-03-06 | House | First Reading |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 40 Nays: 6 |
2019-03-05 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Boles (principal House author) |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Reported Do Pass General Government committee; CR filed |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Second Reading referred to General Government |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Authored by Senator Weaver |
2019-02-04 | Senate | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
SB622 (Carry Over) 2019-04-15 - Coauthored by Representative(s) Boles