OK SB684 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 10-1)
Status: Passed on May 31 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-31 - Approved by Governor 05/31/2013
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 10-1)
Status: Passed on May 31 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-31 - Approved by Governor 05/31/2013
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
State Board of Dentistry; modifying qualifications for certain penalties; permitting Board to waive certain fees. Effective date. Emergency.
Title
State Board of Dentistry; modifying qualifications for certain penalties; permitting Board to waive certain fees. Effective date. Emergency.
Sponsors
Sen. Clark Jolley [R] | Rep. David Derby [R] | Rep. Gus Blackwell [R] | Sen. Brian Crain [R] |
Rep. John Enns [R] | Rep. Eric Proctor [D] | Rep. Pat Ownbey [R] | Rep. Dan Kirby [R] |
Rep. Mike Christian [R] | Sen. Ralph Shortey [R] | Rep. John Bennett [R] |
Roll Calls
2013-05-24 - House - House: EMERGENCY (Y: 68 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 28) [PASS]
2013-05-24 - House - House: PREVIOUS QUESTION (Y: 43 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 52) [PASS]
2013-05-24 - House - House: TABLE PREVIOUS QUESTION (Y: 17 N: 50 NV: 0 Abs: 34) [FAIL]
2013-05-24 - House - House: FOURTH READING (Y: 68 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 29) [PASS]
2013-05-24 - House - House: ADOPT CCR (Y: 64 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 30) [PASS]
2013-05-24 - House - House: TABLE (Y: 4 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 57) [FAIL]
2013-05-23 - Senate - Senate: Fourth Reading (Y: 33 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2013-04-17 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 88 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2013-04-11 - House - House: Government Modernization Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED, STRIKE THE TITLE AND ENACTING CLAUSE (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-05 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-04-06 - House - House: Economic Development, Tourism: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-24 - House - House: PREVIOUS QUESTION (Y: 43 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 52) [PASS]
2013-05-24 - House - House: TABLE PREVIOUS QUESTION (Y: 17 N: 50 NV: 0 Abs: 34) [FAIL]
2013-05-24 - House - House: FOURTH READING (Y: 68 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 29) [PASS]
2013-05-24 - House - House: ADOPT CCR (Y: 64 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 30) [PASS]
2013-05-24 - House - House: TABLE (Y: 4 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 57) [FAIL]
2013-05-23 - Senate - Senate: Fourth Reading (Y: 33 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2013-04-17 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 88 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2013-04-11 - House - House: Government Modernization Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED, STRIKE THE TITLE AND ENACTING CLAUSE (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-05 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-04-06 - House - House: Economic Development, Tourism: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-31 | Senate | Approved by Governor 05/31/2013 |
2013-05-24 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2013-05-24 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2013-05-24 | Senate | Enrolled, to House |
2013-05-24 | Senate | Referred for enrollment |
2013-05-24 | House | To Senate |
2013-05-24 | House | Measure and Emergency Passed: Ayes: 68 Nays: 4; Ayes: 68 Nays: 5 |
2013-05-24 | House | Ayes: 64 Nays: 7 |
2013-05-24 | House | CCR adopted |
2013-05-24 | House | Coauthored by Senator(s) Crain |
2013-05-24 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Proctor, Blackwell, Bennett |
2013-05-24 | House | CCR considered |
2013-05-23 | House | CCR submitted |
2013-05-23 | Senate | Measure and Emergency passed, to House: Ayes: 33 Nays: 5 |
2013-05-23 | Senate | CCR adopted |
2013-05-22 | Senate | Enacting clause restored |
2013-05-22 | Senate | Title restored |
2013-05-22 | Senate | CCR read |
2013-05-22 | Senate | coauthored by Kirby, Enns |
2013-05-21 | Senate | coauthored by Christian |
2013-05-13 | House | Conference granted, naming Conference Committee on Government Modernization |
2013-05-01 | Senate | SCs named Jolley, Crain, Standridge, Griffin, McAffrey, Shumate |
2013-04-23 | Senate | HAs rejected, conference requested |
2013-04-18 | Senate | HAs read |
2013-04-18 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2013-04-17 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2013-04-17 | House | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 88 Nays: 0 |
2013-04-17 | House | General Order |
2013-04-11 | House | Enacting clause stricken |
2013-04-11 | House | Title stricken |
2013-04-11 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Ownbey |
2013-04-11 | House | CR; Do Pass, as amended, Government Modernization Committee |
2013-03-14 | House | Second Reading referred to Government Modernization |
2013-03-06 | House | First Reading |
2013-03-06 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 46 Nays: 0 |
2013-03-05 | Senate | coauthored by Shortey |
2013-03-05 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2013-02-18 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Health and Human Services committee; CR filed |
2013-02-05 | Senate | coauthored by Derby (principal House author) |
2013-02-05 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services |
2013-02-04 | Senate | Authored by Senator Jolley |
2013-02-04 | Senate | First Reading |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
59 | 328 | 15 | New Code | See Bill Text |
59 | 328 | 19 | New Code | See Bill Text |
59 | 328 | 2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
59 | 328 | 21 | New Code | See Bill Text |
59 | 328 | 23 | New Code | See Bill Text |
59 | 328 | 26 | New Code | See Bill Text |
59 | 328 | 27 | New Code | See Bill Text |
59 | 328 | 28a | New Code | See Bill Text |
59 | 328 | 29a | New Code | See Bill Text |
59 | 328 | 3 | New Code | See Bill Text |
59 | 328 | 31 | New Code | See Bill Text |
59 | 328 | 32 | New Code | See Bill Text |
59 | 328 | 33 | New Code | See Bill Text |
59 | 328 | 34 | New Code | See Bill Text |
59 | 328 | 41 | New Code | See Bill Text |
59 | 328 | 44a | New Code | See Bill Text |
59 | 328 | 51a | New Code | See Bill Text |
59 | 328 | 53 | New Code | See Bill Text |
74 | 3601 | 1 | New Code | See Bill Text |