OK SB690 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB690
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-09 - Approved by Governor 05/09/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-09 - Approved by Governor 05/09/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Motor vehicles; modifying certain vehicle height restriction. Effective date. Emergency.
Title
Motor vehicles; modifying certain vehicle height restriction. Effective date. Emergency.
Sponsors
Sen. Mark Allen [R] | Rep. Avery Frix [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-02 - Senate - Senate: FOURTH READING (Y: 42 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-04-18 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - House - House: Rules Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-04-18 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - House - House: Rules Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-09 | Senate | Approved by Governor 05/09/2019 |
2019-05-06 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2019-05-06 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2019-05-06 | Senate | Enrolled, to House |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Referred for enrollment |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 42 Nays: 2 |
2019-05-02 | Senate | HAs adopted |
2019-04-22 | Senate | HAs read |
2019-04-22 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2019-04-18 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2019-04-18 | House | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 97 Nays: 0 |
2019-04-18 | House | General Order |
2019-04-15 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Rules Committee |
2019-04-10 | House | Referred to Rules |
2019-04-10 | House | Withdrawn from Transportation Committee |
2019-03-19 | House | Second Reading referred to Transportation |
2019-03-13 | House | First Reading |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 43 Nays: 0 |
2019-03-12 | Senate | General Order, Amended by Floor Substitute |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Frix (principal House author) |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Transportation committee; CR filed |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Transportation |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Authored by Senator Allen |
2019-02-04 | Senate | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
SB690 (Carry Over) 2019-05-09 - Approved by Governor 05/09/2019