OK SB697 | 2018 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB697
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Vetoed on May 17 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-17 - Vetoed 05/17/2017
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on May 17 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-17 - Vetoed 05/17/2017
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Rulemaking authority; legislative intent; requiring inclusion of statutory reference in rules. Effective date.
Title
Rulemaking authority; legislative intent; requiring inclusion of statutory reference in rules. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-10 - Senate - Senate: FOURTH READING (Y: 32 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-19 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 57 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-04-12 - House - House: Administrative Rules Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-09 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2017-04-19 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 57 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-04-12 - House - House: Administrative Rules Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-09 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-17 | Senate | Vetoed 05/17/2017 |
2017-05-11 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2017-05-11 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2017-05-11 | Senate | Enrolled, to House |
2017-05-10 | Senate | Referred for enrollment |
2017-05-10 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 32 Nays: 14 |
2017-05-10 | Senate | HAs adopted |
2017-04-20 | Senate | HAs read |
2017-04-20 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2017-04-19 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2017-04-19 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 57 Nays: 35 |
2017-04-19 | House | General Order |
2017-04-12 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Administrative Rules Committee |
2017-03-27 | House | Second Reading referred to Administrative Rules |
2017-03-13 | House | First Reading |
2017-03-13 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 40 Nays: 0 |
2017-03-09 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Faught (principal House author) |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Reported Do Pass General Government committee; CR filed |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Second Reading referred to General Government |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Authored by Senator Sykes |
2017-02-06 | Senate | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
SB697 (Carry Over) 2017-05-17 - Vetoed 05/17/2017
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
75 | 250 | 2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
75 | 250 | 3 | New Code | See Bill Text |