OK SCR22 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 25 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-25 - Enrolled, filed with Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 25 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-25 - Enrolled, filed with Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
State parks; approving the transfer of property at Boggy Depot State Park to the Chickasaw Nation.
Title
State parks; approving the transfer of property at Boggy Depot State Park to the Chickasaw Nation.
Sponsors
Sen. Josh Brecheen [R] | Rep. Paul Roan [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-25 | Enrolled, filed with Secretary of State | |
2012-05-25 | Signed, returned to Senate | |
2012-05-25 | Enrolled, to House | |
2012-05-25 | Referred for enrollment | |
2012-05-25 | Adopted, returned to Senate | |
2012-05-25 | Considered | |
2012-05-22 | Introduced | |
2012-05-22 | Engrossed to House | |
2012-05-21 | Adopted, referred for engrossment | |
2012-05-21 | General Order, Amended | |
2012-05-21 | Direct to Calendar | |
2012-05-17 | coauthored by Roan (principal House author) | |
2012-05-17 | Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed | |
2012-02-16 | Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass Appr/Sub-Natural Resources sub-committee | |
2012-02-09 | Referred to Appr/Sub-Natural Resources | |
2012-02-07 | Second Reading referred to Appropriations | |
2012-02-06 | Authored by Senator Brecheen | |
2012-02-06 | First Reading |