OK SCR23 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 21 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-21 - Enrolled, filed with Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 21 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-21 - Enrolled, filed with Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
State parks; approving the transfer of property at Beaver Dunes State Park to the City of Beaver.
Title
State parks; approving the transfer of property at Beaver Dunes State Park to the City of Beaver.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-21 | Enrolled, filed with Secretary of State | |
2012-05-21 | Signed, returned to Senate | |
2012-05-21 | Enrolled, to House | |
2012-05-18 | Referred for enrollment | |
2012-05-18 | Adopted, returned to Senate | |
2012-05-18 | Considered | |
2012-05-17 | Introduced | |
2012-05-17 | Engrossed to House | |
2012-05-16 | Adopted, referred for engrossment | |
2012-05-16 | coauthored by Blackwell (principal House author) | |
2012-05-16 | Considered | |
2012-05-16 | Direct to Calendar | |
2012-02-06 | Authored by Senator Marlatt | |
2012-02-06 | First Reading |