OR HB2086 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Failed on July 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-08 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Failed on July 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-08 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Directs Oregon State Lottery Commission to establish lottery game to benefit veterans' education and economic development.
Title
Relating to Oregon State Lottery games to benefit veterans; appropriating money.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-08 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2013-07-06 | House | Motion to withdraw from Ways and Means failed. Ayes, 29; Nays, 30--Bailey, Barker, Barnhart, Boone, Buckley, Clem, Dembrow, Doherty, Frederick, Gallegos, Garrett, Gelser, Gomberg, Greenlick, Harker, Holvey, Hoyle, Keny-Guyer, Komp, Lively, McKeown, Nathanson, Read, Reardon, Tomei, Unger, Vega Pederson, Williamson, Witt, Speaker Kotek; Excused, 1--Weidner. |
2013-04-29 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2013-04-19 | House | Assigned to Subcommittee On Transportation and Economic Development. |
2013-04-15 | House | Referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2013-04-15 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2013-04-11 | House | Work Session held. |
2013-04-04 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2013-02-21 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2013-01-22 | House | Referred to Veterans' Services and Emergency Preparedness with subsequent referral to Ways and Means. |
2013-01-14 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |