OR HB2275 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on May 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-10 - Chapter 49, (2019 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on May 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-10 - Chapter 49, (2019 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Adds certain individuals to list of persons exempt from real estate licensing law.
Title
Relating to persons exempt from real estate licensing law.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2019-04-24 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-18 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-18 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-10 | House | Chapter 49, (2019 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2020. |
2019-05-02 | House | Governor signed. |
2019-04-26 | Senate | President signed. |
2019-04-25 | House | Speaker signed. |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Olsen. Passed. Ayes, 29; Excused, 1--Winters. |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Carried over to 04-24 by unanimous consent. |
2019-04-22 | Senate | Second reading. |
2019-04-22 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2019-04-18 | Senate | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Referred to Business and General Government. |
2019-02-05 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2019-01-31 | House | Third reading. Carried by Boshart Davis. Passed. Ayes, 60. |
2019-01-30 | House | Second reading. |
2019-01-28 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2019-01-28 | House | Work Session held. |
2019-01-23 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2019-01-15 | House | Referred to Business and Labor. |
2019-01-14 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |