OR HB2323 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 14 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-08-14 - Chapter 732, (2013 Laws): Effective date August 14, 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 14 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-08-14 - Chapter 732, (2013 Laws): Effective date August 14, 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Makes duties, functions and powers of Oregon Growth Board operative January 1, 2014.
Title
Relating to the Oregon Growth Board; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-08-14 | House | Chapter 732, (2013 Laws): Effective date August 14, 2013. |
2013-08-14 | House | Governor signed. |
2013-07-09 | Senate | President signed. |
2013-07-07 | House | Speaker signed. |
2013-07-06 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Shields. Passed. Ayes, 30. |
2013-07-03 | Senate | Second reading. |
2013-07-03 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass the B-Eng. bill. |
2013-07-02 | Senate | Referred to Ways and Means. |
2013-07-02 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2013-07-01 | House | Rules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Read. Passed. Ayes, 50; Nays, 5--Freeman, Hanna, Sprenger, Thatcher, Whitsett; Absent, 1--Krieger; Excused, 2--Bailey, Weidner; Excused for Business of the House, 2--Olson, Speaker Kotek. |
2013-07-01 | House | Second reading. |
2013-07-01 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed B-Engrossed. |
2013-06-28 | House | Work Session held. |
2013-06-18 | House | Returned to Full Committee. |
2013-06-18 | House | Work Session held. |
2013-05-07 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2013-04-19 | House | Assigned to Subcommittee On Transportation and Economic Development. |
2013-04-12 | House | Referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2013-04-12 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2013-04-08 | House | Work Session held. |
2013-03-15 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2013-01-22 | House | Referred to Transportation and Economic Development with subsequent referral to Ways and Means. |
2013-01-14 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |