OR HB4013 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-3)
Status: Failed on March 7 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-07 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-3)
Status: Failed on March 7 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-07 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
This Act excludes glass wine containers from a law that tells producers to take steps to dispose of their packaging. The exclusion lasts for one year. (Flesch Readability Score: 76.5). [Digest: This Act tells the DEQ not to enforce certain laws related to wine packaging. The Act sunsets on July 1, 2026. (Flesch Readability Score: 63.2).] [Prohibits the Department of Environmental Quality from enforcing the provisions of the producer responsibility program applicable to wine packaging.] [Sunsets on July 1, 2026.] Excludes glass wine containers from definition of "covered product" under producer responsibility law until July 1, 2026. Directs Environmental Quality Commission to amend material-specific collection targets for glass. Directs producer responsibility organization to charge one-time fee to members that are producers of glass wine containers. Declares an emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to wine packaging; declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Rep. Anna Scharf [R] | Sen. Mark Meek [D] | Rep. David Gomberg [D] | Rep. Lucetta Elmer [R] |
Sen. David Smith [R] | Rep. Court Boice [R] | Rep. Susan McLain [D] | Rep. Virgle Osborne [R] |
Rep. Boomer Wright [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-02-19 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 56 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-02-14 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-14 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-07 | Senate | In committee upon adjournment. |
2024-02-27 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2024-02-21 | Senate | Referred to Energy and Environment. |
2024-02-20 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2024-02-19 | House | Third reading. Carried by Scharf. Passed. Ayes, 56; Nays, 1--Evans; Excused, 3--Levy E, Lively, Smith G. |
2024-02-16 | House | Second reading. |
2024-02-15 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed. |
2024-02-14 | House | Work Session held. |
2024-02-12 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2024-02-07 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2024-02-05 | House | Referred to Climate, Energy, and Environment. |
2024-02-05 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |