OR HB4045 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 11 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-11 - Chapter 93, (2012 Laws): Effective date April 11, 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 11 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-11 - Chapter 93, (2012 Laws): Effective date April 11, 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the public disclosure of concealed handgun license information; and declaring an emergency.
Title
Relating to the public disclosure of concealed handgun license information; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-11 | Chapter 93, (2012 Laws): Effective date April 11, 2012. | |
2012-04-11 | Governor signed. | |
2012-03-06 | President signed. | |
2012-03-06 | Co-Speakers signed. | |
2012-03-02 | Vote explanation(s) filed by Barnhart, Kotek. | |
2012-03-02 | House concurred in Senate amendments and repassed bill. Ayes, 54; Nays, 6--Bailey, Dembrow, Frederick, Greenlick, Nolan, Tomei. | |
2012-03-01 | Girod, Steiner Hayward declared potential conflict of interest. | |
2012-03-01 | Third reading. Carried by Prozanski. Passed. Ayes, 24; nays, 5--Burdick, Dingfelder, Monroe, Rosenbaum, Shields; excused, 1--Starr. | |
2012-03-01 | Made a Special Order of Business by voice vote. | |
2012-02-29 | Second reading. | |
2012-02-29 | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng. bill. (Printed B-Eng.)(Amendments distributed) | |
2012-02-28 | Work Session held. | |
2012-02-21 | Referred to Rules. | |
2012-02-16 | First reading. Referred to President's desk. | |
2012-02-15 | Vote explanation(s) filed by Kotek. | |
2012-02-15 | Third reading. Carried by Thatcher. Passed. Ayes, 44; Nays, 14--Bailey, Barnhart, Buckley, Dembrow, Frederick, Garrett, Greenlick, Harker, Holvey, Keny-Guyer, Kotek, Nolan, Read, Tomei; Excused, 2--Cowan, Sprenger. | |
2012-02-14 | Second reading. | |
2012-02-13 | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed. | |
2012-02-08 | Public Hearing and Work Session held. | |
2012-02-06 | Public Hearing held. | |
2012-02-01 | Referred to Judiciary. | |
2012-02-01 | First reading. Referred to the desks of the Co-Speakers. |