OR HB4047 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 8 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-08 - Chapter 90, (2014 Laws): Effective date April 1, 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 8 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-08 - Chapter 90, (2014 Laws): Effective date April 1, 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes Task Force on Transportation and Customer Service Efficiency to study customer service performance in Department of Transportation field offices that provide driver and motor vehicle services. Sunsets task force on date of convening of 2015 regular session of Legislative Assembly. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to the Task Force on Transportation and Customer Service Efficiency; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-06 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-03 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 55 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-02-28 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-02-12 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments, be printed engrossed and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-03 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 55 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-02-28 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-02-12 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments, be printed engrossed and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-08 | House | Chapter 90, (2014 Laws): Effective date April 1, 2014. |
2014-04-01 | House | Governor signed. |
2014-03-12 | Senate | President signed. |
2014-03-11 | House | Speaker signed. |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Hansell. Passed.Ayes, 30. |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Second reading. |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill. |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Referred to Ways and Means. |
2014-03-04 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2014-03-03 | House | Rules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Cameron. Passed.Ayes, 55; Nays, 3--Barker, Hicks, Olson; Excused, 2--Berger, Weidner. |
2014-03-03 | House | Second reading. |
2014-03-03 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2014-02-28 | House | Work Session held. |
2014-02-27 | House | Returned to Full Committee. |
2014-02-27 | House | Work Session held. |
2014-02-26 | House | Assigned to Subcommittee On Transportation and Economic Development. |
2014-02-14 | House | Referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2014-02-14 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2014-02-12 | House | Work Session held. |
2014-02-10 | House | Work Session held. |
2014-02-05 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2014-02-03 | House | Referred to Transportation and Economic Development with subsequent referral to Ways and Means. |
2014-02-03 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |