OR HB4113 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-3)
Status: Passed on April 14 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-14 - Chapter 80, (2016 Laws): Effective date March 29, 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-3)
Status: Passed on April 14 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-14 - Chapter 80, (2016 Laws): Effective date March 29, 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes Task Force on Drought Emergency Response as nonlegislative task force. Requires task force to research and evaluate potential tools to prepare for or deal with drought emergencies. Requires task force to report to interim committee of Legislative Assembly by November 1, 2016. Appropriates moneys from General Fund to fund task force. Sunsets task force December 31, 2016. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to the Task Force on Drought Emergency Response; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Sen. Shemia Fagan [D] | Rep. Jodi Hack [R] | Rep. Brian Clem [D] | Sen. Arnie Roblan [D] |
Rep. Joe Gallegos [D] | Rep. David Gomberg [D] | Rep. Ken Helm [D] | Rep. John Huffman [R] |
Rep. Julie Parrish [R] | Rep. Bradley Witt [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-03-02 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 22 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-02-26 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 53 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2016-02-23 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng bill. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-02-03 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-26 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 53 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2016-02-23 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng bill. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-02-03 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-14 | House | Chapter 80, (2016 Laws): Effective date March 29, 2016. |
2016-03-29 | House | Governor signed. |
2016-03-09 | Senate | President signed. |
2016-03-09 | House | Speaker signed. |
2016-03-02 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Roblan. Passed.Ayes, 22; nays, 6--Baertschiger Jr, Boquist, Olsen, Thatcher, Thomsen, Whitsett; excused, 2--Shields, Winters. |
2016-03-01 | Senate | Second reading. |
2016-03-01 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass the B-Eng. bill. |
2016-03-01 | Senate | Referred to Ways and Means. |
2016-02-29 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2016-02-26 | House | Third reading. Carried by Hack. Passed.Ayes, 53; Nays, 2--Sprenger, Whitsett; Absent, 1--Clem; Excused, 4--Boone, Heard, Smith, Witt. |
2016-02-25 | House | Second reading. |
2016-02-24 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed B-Engrossed. |
2016-02-23 | House | Work Session held. |
2016-02-23 | House | Returned to Full Committee. |
2016-02-23 | House | Work Session held. |
2016-02-17 | House | Assigned to Subcommittee On Natural Resources. |
2016-02-04 | House | Referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2016-02-04 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2016-02-03 | House | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2016-02-01 | House | Referred to Rural Communities, Land Use and Water with subsequent referral to Ways and Means. |
2016-02-01 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2016-01-27 | House | Presession Released to the Public. |