OR HB4170 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 27 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-27 - Chapter 74, (2012 Laws): Effective date June 4, 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 27 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-27 - Chapter 74, (2012 Laws): Effective date June 4, 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to dog training; and prescribing an effective date.
Title
Relating to dog training; and prescribing an effective date.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-27 | Chapter 74, (2012 Laws): Effective date June 4, 2012. | |
2012-03-27 | Governor signed. | |
2012-03-06 | President signed. | |
2012-03-06 | Co-Speakers signed. | |
2012-03-02 | House concurred in Senate amendments and repassed bill. Ayes, 60. | |
2012-03-01 | Third reading. Carried by Atkinson. Passed. Ayes, 29; excused, 1--Boquist. | |
2012-02-29 | Second reading. | |
2012-02-29 | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng. bill. (Printed B-Eng.)(Amendments distributed) | |
2012-02-28 | Work Session held. | |
2012-02-27 | Public Hearing held. | |
2012-02-25 | Referred to Rules. | |
2012-02-25 | First reading. Referred to President's desk. | |
2012-02-24 | Third reading. Carried by Olson, Holvey. Passed. Ayes, 60. | |
2012-02-23 | Second reading. | |
2012-02-22 | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed. | |
2012-02-21 | Work Session held. | |
2012-02-20 | Work Session held. | |
2012-02-16 | Public Hearing held. | |
2012-02-13 | Referred to Rules. | |
2012-02-13 | First reading. Referred to the desks of the Co-Speakers. |