OR SB1502 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-4)
Status: Passed on March 28 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-28 - Effective date, January 1, 2025.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-4)
Status: Passed on March 28 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-28 - Effective date, January 1, 2025.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Requires most public schools and college boards to video record their meetings and post the meeting recordings on their websites and social media sites. This does not apply if a meeting is private or if a school district is very small. (Flesch Readability Score: 61.7). [Digest: Requires public schools and college boards to live stream their meetings and post the meeting recordings on their websites and social media sites. This does not apply if a meeting is private. Allows remote testimony for most school and college board meetings. (Flesch Readability Score: 65.7).] [Requires the governing bodies of school districts, education service districts, community college districts and public universities to live stream governing body meetings, if technically practicable, and to post the recordings of the meetings on their official public body websites or social media sites. Excepts executive sessions. Requires educational institution governing bodies to also permit witnesses to testify via telephonic, electronic or virtual means if meetings also permit in-person oral testimony.] Requires school districts, education service districts, community college districts and public universities to make video recordings of governing body meetings or, if the public body's facilities lack broadband Internet access, to make audio recordings, and to post the video or audio recordings, as applicable, of the meetings on their official public body websites or social media sites. Excepts executive sessions and does not apply to school districts with less than 50 students.
Title
Relating to public meetings of educational institution boards.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-04 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 55 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-02-28 - House - House Committee Do Pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-21 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-13 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. Refer to Ways and Means by prior reference. (Printed A-Eng) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-28 - House - House Committee Do Pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-21 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-13 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. Refer to Ways and Means by prior reference. (Printed A-Eng) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-28 | Senate | Effective date, January 1, 2025. |
2024-03-28 | Senate | Chapter 47, 2024 Laws. |
2024-03-27 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2024-03-06 | House | Speaker signed. |
2024-03-06 | Senate | President signed. |
2024-03-04 | House | Rules suspended. Third reading. Carried by McIntire, Ruiz. Passed. Ayes, 55; Nays, 1--Cate; Excused, 3--Boshart Davis, Cramer, Javadi; Excused for Business of the House, 1--Scharf. |
2024-03-04 | House | Second reading. |
2024-03-01 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2024-02-28 | House | Work Session held. |
2024-02-26 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2024-02-22 | House | Referred to Education. |
2024-02-22 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2024-02-21 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by President Wagner. Passed. Ayes, 29; Nays, 1--Findley. |
2024-02-20 | Senate | Second reading. |
2024-02-19 | Senate | Subsequent referral rescinded by order of the President. |
2024-02-19 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and subsequent referral to Ways and Means be rescinded. (Printed A-Eng.) |
2024-02-13 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2024-02-06 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2024-02-05 | Senate | Referred to Education, then Ways and Means. |
2024-02-05 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |