OR SB1541 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-03 - Effective date, June 6, 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-03 - Effective date, June 6, 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Extends sunset for tax credit for crop donation. Increases percentage of wholesale price allowed as amount of credit. Applies to tax years beginning on or after January 1, 2014. Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.
Title
Relating to tax credits for crop donation; and prescribing an effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-04 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2014-02-25 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-14 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-12 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-25 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-14 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-12 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-03 | Senate | Effective date, June 6, 2014. |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Chapter 115, 2014 Laws. |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2014-03-06 | House | Speaker signed. |
2014-03-06 | Senate | President signed. |
2014-03-04 | House | Potential conflict(s) of interest declared by Clem. |
2014-03-04 | House | Third reading. Carried by Barnhart. Passed.Ayes, 55; Absent, 1--Richardson; Excused, 2--Berger, Weidner; Excused for Business of the House, 2--Harker, Olson. |
2014-03-03 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to March 4, 2014 Calendar. |
2014-02-28 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to March 3, 2014 Calendar. |
2014-02-27 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to February 28, 2014 Calendar. |
2014-02-26 | House | Second reading. |
2014-02-25 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2014-02-25 | House | Work Session held. |
2014-02-19 | House | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2014-02-14 | House | Referred to Revenue. |
2014-02-14 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2014-02-14 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Thomsen. Passed.Ayes, 30. |
2014-02-13 | Senate | Second reading. |
2014-02-13 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2014-02-12 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2014-02-10 | Senate | Work Session cancelled. |
2014-02-05 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2014-02-03 | Senate | Referred to Finance and Revenue. |
2014-02-03 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |