OR SB1558 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 28 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-28 - Effective date, March 27, 2024.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 28 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-28 - Effective date, March 27, 2024.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Does not apply the shortened school day law to certain class periods or types of instruction. (Flesch Readability Score: 68.9). Makes an exception to abbreviated school day requirements for when a student voluntarily does not schedule a class for one or more class periods or for certain asynchronous instruction. Declares an emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to exceptions to abbreviated school day requirements for schedules for which a determination of the satisfaction of high school graduation requirements must be made; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-05 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2024-02-28 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-21 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-15 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-28 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-21 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-15 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-28 | Senate | Effective date, March 27, 2024. |
2024-03-28 | Senate | Chapter 59, 2024 Laws. |
2024-03-27 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2024-03-07 | House | Speaker signed. |
2024-03-07 | Senate | President signed. |
2024-03-05 | House | Third reading. Carried by Hudson. Passed. Ayes, 54; Excused, 5--Boshart Davis, Bynum, Cramer, Neron, Owens; Excused for Business of the House, 1--Diehl. |
2024-03-04 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to March 5, 2024 Calendar. |
2024-03-04 | House | Second reading. |
2024-03-01 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2024-02-28 | House | Work Session held. |
2024-02-26 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2024-02-21 | House | Referred to Education. |
2024-02-21 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2024-02-21 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Gelser Blouin. Passed. Ayes, 30. |
2024-02-20 | Senate | Carried over to 02-21 by unanimous consent. |
2024-02-19 | Senate | Second reading. |
2024-02-19 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2024-02-15 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2024-02-13 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2024-02-05 | Senate | Referred to Education. |
2024-02-05 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |