OR SB1565 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Failed on March 7 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-07 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Failed on March 7 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-07 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
The Act requires the DHS to pay parents to provide in-home care for minor children with disabilities. The Act requires DHS to seek out all means to get federal matching funds from the Centers for Medicare and Medicaid Services to pay for the care. (Flesch Readability Score: 61.4). [Digest: The Act requires the DHS to pay for a certain number of hours of in-home care for minor children with disabilities. The Act requires DHS to seek out all means to get federal matching funds from the Centers for Medicare and Medicaid Services to pay for the care. (Flesch Readability Score: 62.6).] Requires the Department of Human Services to pay [for] parents to provide attendant care services for children with developmental disabilities who have very high behavioral health needs or very high medical needs. [Requires the department, for children in each category, to pay for no less hours of attendant care services for a child than for the average attendant care hours utilized by the children in the same category and to supplement underutilized hours by paying the child's parent to provide the services.] Directs the department to seek any federal funding available for attendant care services no later than [April 1, 2024] January 1, 2025. Declares an emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to developmental disability services; declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Sen. Cedric Hayden [R] | Sen. Daniel Bonham [R] | Sen. Lynn Findley [R] | Sen. Tim Knopp [R] |
Sen. David Smith [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-02-14 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. Refer to Ways and Means by prior reference. (Printed A-Eng) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-07 | Senate | In committee upon adjournment. |
2024-02-15 | Senate | Referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2024-02-15 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. (Printed A-Eng.) |
2024-02-14 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2024-02-12 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2024-02-05 | Senate | Referred to Health Care, then Ways and Means. |
2024-02-05 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |