OR SB1603 | 2020 | 1st Special Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Passed on July 13 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-13 - Effective date, September 25, 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Passed on July 13 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-13 - Effective date, September 25, 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies definitions applicable for purposes of universal service surcharge. Modifies definitions applicable for purposes of universal service surcharge. Subjects sale of retail commercial mobile radio services and retail interconnected voice over internet protocol services to universal service surcharge. Reduces rate cap to six percent of sale of services subject to surcharge. Directs Public Utility Commission to transfer up to $5 million per year of moneys deposited in universal service fund to Broadband Fund. Establishes Broadband Fund. Continuously appropriates moneys in Broadband Fund to Oregon Business Development Department to provide grants and loans through, and to administer, program related to broadband. Directs department to adopt program for providing grants and loans by rule. Directs department to report annually to interim committee of Legislative Assembly related to telecommunications on status of Broadband Fund. Sunsets Broadband Fund, transfer of moneys from universal service fund to Broadband Fund and grant program on January 2, 2030. Becomes operative on January 1, 2021. Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.
Title
Relating to the universal service fund; and prescribing an effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-06-26 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 38 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-06-26 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 16 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-06-24 - Senate - Senate Committee Do Pass (Y: 8 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-24 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 8 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-26 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 16 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-06-24 - Senate - Senate Committee Do Pass (Y: 8 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-24 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 8 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-13 | Senate | Effective date, September 25, 2020. |
2020-07-13 | Senate | Chapter 17, 2020 Laws. |
2020-07-07 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2020-07-07 | House | Speaker signed. |
2020-06-30 | Senate | President signed. |
2020-06-26 | House | Vote explanation(s) filed by Leif, Moore-Green, Smith DB, Sollman. |
2020-06-26 | House | Rules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Marsh. Passed. Ayes, 38; Nays, 19--Bonham, Boshart Davis, Breese-Iverson, Drazan, Hayden, Helt, Leif, Lewis, Moore-Green, Nearman, Owens, Post, Reschke, Smith DB, Sprenger, Stark, Wallan, Wilson, Zika; Excused, 3--Barker, Barreto, Clem. |
2020-06-26 | House | Rules suspended. Second reading. |
2020-06-26 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2020-06-26 | House | Referred to The First Special Session of 2020. |
2020-06-26 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2020-06-26 | Senate | Vote explanation filed by Boquist. |
2020-06-26 | Senate | Rules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Roblan. Passed. Ayes, 16; Nays, 10--Baertschiger Jr, Beyer, Boquist, Findley, Girod, Heard, Johnson, Knopp, Thatcher, Thomsen; Excused, 4--Boles, Hansell, Linthicum, Olsen. |
2020-06-26 | Senate | Rules suspended. Second reading. |
2020-06-26 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2020-06-24 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2020-06-24 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2020-06-24 | Senate | Referred to The First Special Session of 2020. |
2020-06-24 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |