OR SB247 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on June 25 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-25 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on June 25 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-25 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Undoes provisions adopted in Senate Bill 762 (2021). Undoes provisions adopted in Senate Bill 762 (2021). Declares emergency, effective July 1, 2023.
Title
Relating to wildfire; declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-25 | Senate | In committee upon adjournment. |
2023-01-13 | Senate | Referred to Natural Resources. |
2023-01-09 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |