OR SB271 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on August 21 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-08-21 - Effective date, August 14, 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on August 21 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-08-21 - Effective date, August 14, 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Abolishes Oregon Educator Professional Development Commission.
Title
Relating to educator professional development; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-08-21 | Senate | Effective date, August 14, 2013. |
2013-08-21 | Senate | Chapter 769, 2013 Laws. |
2013-08-14 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2013-07-07 | House | Speaker signed. |
2013-07-05 | Senate | President signed. |
2013-06-28 | House | Rules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Frederick. Passed. Ayes, 57; Nays, 2--Freeman, Gilliam; Excused for Business of the House, 1--McLane. |
2013-06-28 | House | Second reading. |
2013-06-28 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2013-06-26 | House | Referred to Ways and Means. |
2013-06-26 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2013-06-26 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Girod. Passed. Ayes, 27; nays, 2--Close, Whitsett; excused, 1--Boquist. |
2013-06-25 | Senate | Second reading. |
2013-06-24 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) |
2013-06-21 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2013-06-13 | Senate | Returned to Full Committee. |
2013-06-13 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2013-05-22 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2013-05-08 | Senate | Assigned to Subcommittee On Education. |
2013-02-19 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2013-02-14 | Senate | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2013-01-18 | Senate | Referred to Education and Workforce Development, then Ways and Means. |
2013-01-14 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |