OR SB451 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on July 6 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-06 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on July 6 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-06 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes prudent maximum amount of outstanding General Fund-supported debt as amount for which debt service due in biennium equals five percent of General Fund revenues estimated to be received in biennium. Prohibits State Treasurer from incurring General Fund-supported debt in excess of prudent maximum amount unless law that authorizes General Fund-supported debt explicitly takes exception to prudent maximum amount. Declares emergency, effective July 1, 2015.
Title
Relating to prudent maximum General Fund-supported debt; declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Sen. Fred Girod [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-07-06 | Senate | In committee upon adjournment. |
2015-01-20 | Senate | Referred to Rules, then Ways and Means. |
2015-01-12 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |
Oregon State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2015R1/Measures/Overview/SB451 |
Text | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2015R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB451/Introduced |