OR SB526 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-4)
Status: Enrolled on June 19 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-06-25 - Speaker signed.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Directs Oregon Health Authority to design, implement and maintain voluntary statewide program to provide nurse home visiting services to families with infants up to six months of age. Specifies desired outcomes and services. Requires authority to adopt rules specifying criteria for coverage of newborn nurse home visiting service coverage by health benefit plans. Requires health benefit plans to cover nurse home visiting services to enrollees with newborns without cost-sharing. Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to home visiting; and prescribing an effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-19 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 48 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-06-13 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 22 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-06-07 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng bill. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 18 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-18 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments and requesting referral to Ways and Means. (Printed A-Engrossed.) (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-25HouseSpeaker signed.
2019-06-24SenatePresident signed.
2019-06-19HouseThird reading. Carried by Schouten. Passed. Ayes, 48; Nays, 11--Barreto, Boshart Davis, Hayden, Leif, Nearman, Noble, Post, Reschke, Sprenger, Wallan, Wilson; Excused for Business of the House, 1--Power.
2019-06-18HouseSecond reading.
2019-06-18HouseRecommendation: Do pass.
2019-06-17HouseReferred to Ways and Means.
2019-06-17HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
2019-06-13SenateThird reading. Carried by Steiner Hayward. Passed. Ayes, 22; Nays, 5--Girod, Linthicum, Olsen, Thatcher, Thomsen; Excused, 2--Boquist, Johnson.
2019-06-12SenateSecond reading.
2019-06-11SenateRecommendation: Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng. bill. (Printed B-Eng.)
2019-06-07SenateWork Session held.
2019-06-04SenateReturned to Full Committee.
2019-06-04SenateWork Session held.
2019-05-28SenateAssigned to Subcommittee On Human Services.
2019-03-26SenateReferred to Ways and Means by order of the President.
2019-03-26SenateRecommendation: Do pass with amendments and be referred to Ways and Means. (Printed A-Eng.)
2019-03-18SenateWork Session held.
2019-01-28SenatePublic Hearing held.
2019-01-16SenateReferred to Health Care.
2019-01-14SenateIntroduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.

Oregon State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2019R1/Measures/Overview/SB526
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2019R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB526/Introduced
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2019R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB526/Senate%20Amendments%20to%20Introduced
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2019R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB526/A-Engrossed
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2019R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB526/Senate%20Amendments%20to%20A-Engrossed
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2019R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB526/B-Engrossed
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2019R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB526/Enrolled
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2019R1/CommitteeReports/MajorityReport/28210
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2019R1/CommitteeReports/MajorityReport/29856
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2019R1/Measures/MeasureVotes?id=474703
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2019R1/Measures/MeasureVotes?id=476336

Bill Comments

feedback