OR SB5540 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on August 14 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-14 - Effective date, August 9, 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on August 14 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-14 - Effective date, August 9, 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Limits expenditures of lottery funds from Watershed Conservation Grant Fund for local grant expenditures by Oregon Watershed Enhancement Board for six-year period beginning July 1, 2019. Declares emergency, effective July 1, 2019.
Title
Relating to the financial administration of the Oregon Watershed Enhancement Board; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2019-06-29 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-06-29 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 26 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-06-14 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-06-29 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 26 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-06-14 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-08-14 | Senate | Effective date, August 9, 2019. |
2019-08-14 | Senate | Chapter 697, 2019 Laws. |
2019-08-09 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2019-07-03 | House | Speaker signed. |
2019-07-03 | Senate | President signed. |
2019-06-29 | House | Rules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Reardon. Passed. Ayes, 52; Excused, 7--Clem, Greenlick, Hernandez, McKeown, Noble, Smith DB, Wallan. |
2019-06-29 | House | Potential conflict(s) of interest declared by Power. |
2019-06-29 | House | Rules suspended. Second reading. |
2019-06-29 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2019-06-29 | House | Referred to Ways and Means. |
2019-06-29 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2019-06-29 | Senate | Vote explanation filed by Steiner Hayward. |
2019-06-29 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Steiner Hayward. Passed. Ayes, 26; Nays, 1--Thatcher; Absent, 2--Girod, Linthicum; Excused, 1--Boquist. |
2019-06-19 | Senate | Second reading. |
2019-06-18 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) |
2019-06-14 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2019-06-06 | Senate | Returned to Full Committee. |
2019-06-06 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2019-01-23 | Senate | Assigned to Subcommittee On Natural Resources. |
2019-01-15 | Senate | Referred to Ways and Means. |
2019-01-14 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |