OR SB61 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on July 28 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-28 - Effective date, October 5, 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on July 28 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-28 - Effective date, October 5, 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies list of jurisdictions of incorporation for which income must be included on Oregon corporate excise tax return, if corporation is member of unitary group with Oregon corporation. Allows adjustment of reported income received in listed jurisdiction but not attributable to transactions or activity of United States affiliates.] Confirms that additional methods of determining business activity may apply, per petition of taxpayer or with permission of Department of Revenue. Sets forth criteria to be used to determine listed jurisdictions. Directs Legislative Revenue Officer to report to Legislative Assembly on policy requiring corporations with subsidiaries in listed jurisdictions to report income in those jurisdictions. Applies to tax years beginning on or after January 1, 2016. Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.
Title
Relating to tax reporting of multinational corporations; and prescribing an effective date.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2015-07-03 - Senate - Senate Third Reading in Concurrence (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-07-02 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-07-01 - House - House Committee Do pass as amended and be printed engrossed (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-30 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-06-26 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-24 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-07-02 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-07-01 - House - House Committee Do pass as amended and be printed engrossed (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-30 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-06-26 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-24 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-07-28 | Senate | Effective date, October 5, 2015. |
2015-07-28 | Senate | Chapter 755, 2015 Laws. |
2015-07-21 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2015-07-09 | House | Speaker signed. |
2015-07-07 | Senate | President signed. |
2015-07-03 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments and repassed bill.Ayes, 29; excused, 1--Olsen. |
2015-07-02 | House | Vote explanation(s) filed by Nosse. |
2015-07-02 | House | Rules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Barnhart. Passed.Ayes, 58; Nays, 1--Nosse; Excused, 1--Barton. |
2015-07-02 | House | Second reading. |
2015-07-01 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed B-Engrossed. |
2015-07-01 | House | Work Session held. |
2015-06-30 | House | Referred to Revenue. |
2015-06-30 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2015-06-30 | Senate | Rules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Hass. Passed.Ayes, 28; excused, 2--Olsen, Shields. |
2015-06-30 | Senate | Second reading. |
2015-06-29 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) |
2015-06-26 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2015-06-24 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2015-06-22 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2015-06-18 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2015-06-16 | Senate | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2015-02-09 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2015-01-20 | Senate | Referred to Finance and Revenue. |
2015-01-12 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |