OR SB723 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on June 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-26 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on June 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-26 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires nonprofit corporations that meet certain requirements, including receipt of public funds, to comply with open meetings law and public records law, to post copy of corporation's proposed annual budget to corporation's public website and to submit to and cooperate with audit. Requires nonprofit corporations that meet certain requirements, including receipt of public funds, to comply with open meetings law and public records law, to post copy of corporation's proposed annual budget to corporation's public website and to submit to and cooperate with audit. Subjects members of corporation's board of directors and officers and employees of corporation to government ethics standards. Becomes operative January 1, 2022. Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.
Title
Relating to nonprofit corporations that receive public funds; prescribing an effective date.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-26 | Senate | In committee upon adjournment. |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Referred to Labor and Business. |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |
Oregon State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Measures/Overview/SB723 |
Text | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB723/Introduced |