OR SB823 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Failed on July 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-08 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Failed on July 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-08 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Requires Oregon Health Authority to create new programs and expand existing programs to increase capacity statewide to provide mental health services and serve individuals with mental illness.
Title
Relating to mental health services; declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-08 | Senate | In committee upon adjournment. |
2013-04-22 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. (Printed A-Eng.) |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2013-04-09 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2013-03-26 | Senate | Referred to Health Care and Human Services, then Ways and Means. |
2013-03-25 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |