OR SCR208 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on February 28 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-02-28 - Filed With Secretary of State.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on February 28 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-02-28 - Filed With Secretary of State.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Honors a music group for promoting the arts in Oregon. (Flesch Readability Score: 61.3). Commemorates the 25th anniversary of the founding of Inland Northwest Musicians.
Title
Commemorating the 25th anniversary of the founding of Inland Northwest Musicians.
Sponsors
Sen. Rob Wagner [D] | Sen. Bill Hansell [R] | Sen. James Manning [D] | Rep. Bobby Levy [R] |
Rep. Gregory Smith [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-02-26 - House - House Read under Consent Calendar (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-02-22 - House - House Committee Be adopted and be placed on the Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-20 - Senate - Senate Final Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-15 - Senate - Senate Committee Do adopt (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-22 - House - House Committee Be adopted and be placed on the Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-20 - Senate - Senate Final Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-15 - Senate - Senate Committee Do adopt (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-28 | Senate | Filed With Secretary of State. |
2024-02-27 | House | Speaker signed. |
2024-02-27 | Senate | President signed. |
2024-02-26 | House | Read under Consent Calendar. Passed. Ayes, 56; Excused, 3--Boshart Davis, Helm, Pham K; Excused for Business of the House, 1--Speaker Rayfield. |
2024-02-23 | House | Recommendation: Be adopted and be placed on Consent Calendar. |
2024-02-22 | House | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2024-02-21 | House | Referred to Rules. |
2024-02-21 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2024-02-20 | Senate | Final reading. Carried by Hansell. Adopted. Ayes, 30. |
2024-02-19 | Senate | Second reading. |
2024-02-19 | Senate | Recommendation: Do adopt. |
2024-02-15 | Senate | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2024-02-05 | Senate | Referred to Rules. |
2024-02-05 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |