PA HB103 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 15 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-04-22 - Referred to LOCAL GOVERNMENT
Pending: Senate Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending the act of July 31, 1968 (P.L.805, No.247), known as the Pennsylvania Municipalities Planning Code, in subdivision and land development, providing for nonbuilding lots.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

In subdivision and land development, providing for nonbuilding lots.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-15 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-15 - House - House Floor: HB 103 PN 1373, FP (Y: 125 N: 73 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - House - House Floor: HB 103 PN 102, 2019 A408, MALONEY (Y: 189 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2019-03-20 - House - House Local Government: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-22SenateReferred to LOCAL GOVERNMENT
2019-04-15SenateIn the Senate
2019-04-15HouseThird consideration and final passage (125-73)
2019-04-15HouseRe-reported as committed
2019-04-10HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2019-04-10HouseSecond consideration, with amendments
2019-04-09HouseRemoved from table
2019-03-20HouseLaid on the table
2019-03-20HouseFirst consideration
2019-03-20HouseReported as committed
2019-01-28HouseReferred to LOCAL GOVERNMENT

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2019&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=103
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0103&pn=0102
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0103&pn=1373
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=30&theDate=03/20/2019&RollCallId=155
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=171
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=186
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=04/15/2019&RollCallId=269

Bill Comments

feedback