PA HB1034 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 11-3)
Status: Engrossed on June 28 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-10-03 - Removed from table
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 28 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-10-03 - Removed from table
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Title 53 (Municipalities Generally) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in municipal authorities, further providing for money of authority.
Title
In municipal authorities, further providing for money of authority.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-21 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-23 - Senate - Senate Local Government: Reported as Committed (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-28 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-28 - House - House Floor: HB 1034 PN 2157, FP (Y: 198 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-06-27 - House - House Rules: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-27 - House - House Floor: HB 1034 PN 1311, 2017 A2076, MAKO (Y: 197 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-06-14 - House - House Local Government: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-23 - Senate - Senate Local Government: Reported as Committed (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-28 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-28 - House - House Floor: HB 1034 PN 2157, FP (Y: 198 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-06-27 - House - House Rules: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-27 - House - House Floor: HB 1034 PN 1311, 2017 A2076, MAKO (Y: 197 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-06-14 - House - House Local Government: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-10-03 | Senate | Removed from table |
2018-10-03 | Senate | Laid on the table |
2018-06-18 | Senate | Removed from table |
2018-06-18 | Senate | Laid on the table |
2018-05-21 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2018-03-26 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2018-03-26 | Senate | Second consideration |
2018-01-23 | Senate | First consideration |
2018-01-23 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2017-07-06 | Senate | Referred to LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2017-06-28 | Senate | In the Senate |
2017-06-28 | House | Third consideration and final passage (198-0) |
2017-06-28 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2017-06-27 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2017-06-27 | House | Second consideration, with amendments |
2017-06-27 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2017-06-14 | House | Re-committed to RULES |
2017-06-14 | House | First consideration |
2017-06-14 | House | Reported as committed |
2017-04-10 | House | Referred to LOCAL GOVERNMENT |