PA HB1057 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 13-2)
Status: Engrossed on March 27 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-04-10 - Referred to GAME AND FISHERIES
Pending: Senate Game & Fisheries Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 27 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-04-10 - Referred to GAME AND FISHERIES
Pending: Senate Game & Fisheries Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An Act amending Title 34 (Game) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in hunting and furtaking, further providing for penalties; and, in protection of property and persons, further providing for safety zones.
Title
In hunting and furtaking, further providing for penalties; and, in protection of property and persons, further providing for safety zones.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-27 - House - HB 1057 PN 3269, FP (Y: 196 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-03-26 - House - HB 1057 PN 1148, 2011 A9234, HALUSKA (Y: 193 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2012-03-26 - House - HB 1057 PN 1148, 2011 A9234, HALUSKA (Y: 193 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-10 | Senate | Referred to GAME AND FISHERIES |
2012-03-27 | Senate | In the Senate |
2012-03-27 | House | Third consideration and final passage (196-0) |
2012-03-27 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2012-03-26 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2012-03-26 | House | Second consideration, with amendments |
2012-03-12 | House | Removed from table |
2011-06-13 | House | Laid on the table |
2011-06-13 | House | Removed from table |
2011-04-13 | House | Laid on the table |
2011-04-13 | House | First consideration |
2011-04-13 | House | Reported as committed |
2011-03-15 | House | Referred to GAME AND FISHERIES |